MA H3927 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Christina Ruccio, an employee of the Suffolk County Sheriff's Department. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Christina Ruccio, an employee of the Suffolk County Sheriff's Department

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-20 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
2021-08-16SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-08-16HouseEnacted
2021-08-16SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-08-16HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-08-12SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-08-12SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-08-05SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2021-07-29HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-07-28HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-07-28HouseRules suspended
2021-07-28HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-07-26HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-07-01SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2021-06-21HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3904 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - Senate concurred
H3992 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4064
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback