MA S1023 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2665

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2665
2021-11-30JointHearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2023 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3904 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - Senate concurred
H3927 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H4064 (Similar To) 2021-08-19 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2675 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S422 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1003 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback