MA H3904 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Racquel Cardoza, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Racquel Cardoza, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-17HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2021-05-13HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3704 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3769
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
H3875 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3915 (Similar To) 2021-08-09 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3927 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2021
H3992 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4064
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
H4094 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback