MA S96 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to lift kids out of deep poverty. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To lift kids out of deep poverty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H199 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S155 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4055 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4016
S155 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4055 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S96 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S96.pdf |