MA H966 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote value-based health insurance design in the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
To promote value-based insurance design in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S697 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S697 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H966 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H966.pdf |