MA H844 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5116
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts Water Management Act. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect the rights of municipalities and districts
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5116 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
H1633 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1437 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2155 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S893 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S968 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5116 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
H1633 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1437 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2155 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S893 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S968 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5116 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H844.pdf |