MA H4721 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to estate tax, personal income tax and other related matters.
Title
Study Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-06-13 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2024-06-13 | House | Accompanied by S1775, S1784, S1796, S1802, S1816, S1817, S1820, S1826, S1845, S1857, S1865, S1867, S1926, S1939, S1946, S1959, H42, H2719, H2726, H2734, H2745, H2748, H2757, H2766, H2785, H2803, H2805, H2834, H2843, H2850, H2851, H2862, H2875, H2877, H2887, H2888, H2908, H2909, H2918, H2922, H2936, H2939, H2952, H2960, H2961, H2965, H3666, H3858, H3882 and H4029 |
2024-06-13 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1775 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1784 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1796 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1802 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1816 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1817 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1820 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1826 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1845 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1857 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1865 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1867 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1926 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1939 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1946 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1959 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H42 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2719 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2726 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2734 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2745 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2748 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2757 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2766 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2785 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2803 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2805 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2834 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2843 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2850 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2851 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2862 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2875 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2877 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2887 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2888 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2908 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2909 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2918 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2922 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2936 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2939 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2952 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2960 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2961 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2965 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3666 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3858 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3882 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4029 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4720 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4725 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4727 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4870 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4871 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1784 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1796 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1802 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1816 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1817 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1820 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1826 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1845 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1857 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1865 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1867 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1926 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1939 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1946 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1959 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H42 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2719 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2726 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2734 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2745 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2748 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2757 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2766 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2785 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2803 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2805 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2834 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2843 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2850 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2851 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2862 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2875 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2877 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2887 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2888 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2908 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2909 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2918 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2922 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2936 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2939 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2952 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2960 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2961 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2965 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3666 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3858 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H3882 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4029 (Replaces) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4720 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4725 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4727 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4870 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4871 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4721 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4721.pdf |