MA S1926 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4721
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to deeds excise receipts. Revenue.
Title
Relative to deeds excise receipts
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4721 |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2922 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4721 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4721 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1926.pdf |