MA S1939 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4721

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to improving Massachusetts’ competitiveness and reduce the cost of living. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to improving Massachusetts’ competitiveness and reduce the cost of living

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4721
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-03-23JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H48 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S1629 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2427 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2486 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2487 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4721 (Replaced by) 2024-06-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback