MA H2887 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow taxpayers to have the option to indicate on their income tax return that they do not want any portion of their income tax liability to be utilized for abortion services. Revenue.
Title
Relative to taxpayer conscience protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2047 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2959 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2725 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S2446 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2959 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2725 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S2446 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2887 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2887.pdf |