MA H2888 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that state payments in lieu of taxes (PILOT) to cities and towns not be less than the previous fiscal year. Revenue.
Title
Ensuring consistent reimbursement of PILOT funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4104 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2023
S2536 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2536 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2888.pdf |