MA H2719 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4721
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce the short-term capital gains tax. Revenue.
Title
To reduce the short-term capital gains tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4721 |
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H784 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Accompanied S570
H4481 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4721 (Replaced by) 2024-06-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2830 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2833
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2939 (Similar To) 2024-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4481 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4721 (Replaced by) 2024-06-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2830 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2833
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2939 (Similar To) 2024-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2719 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2719.pdf |