MA H2875 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to memorializing the Massachusetts congressional delegation and the President of the United States to support the moral budget, and for an investigation by a commission (including members of the General Court) on the impact of passage of the moral budget. Revenue.
Title
To establish a commission to report on the moral budget
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2875.pdf |