NH HB1568 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2160s (Rep. W. MacDonald): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2160s (Rep. W. MacDonald): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services under the state Medicaid plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services under the state Medicaid plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2160s (Rep. W. MacDonald): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2160s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2024-2160s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 20A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1727s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1727s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1727s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 237-136 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 174 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/20/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 33 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 |