MA H2877 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to taxable estate. Revenue.
Title
To encourage Massachusetts residency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4198 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2580 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4198 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2580 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2877 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2877.pdf |