MA H4260 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3279
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to survivor retirement benefits
Title
Relative to survivor retirement benefits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-05 | House | New draft of H3279 |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3279 (Replaces) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2494 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - See S2481
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H5028 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2018
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2494 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - See S2481
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H5028 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4260.pdf |