MA H4080 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4928
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4928
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4928
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Higgins of Leominster, a petition of Natalie M. Higgins that the State 911 Department publish on its website a statewide disability indicator form. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to more accessible 911 disability indicator forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4928 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-08-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H366 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S785 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2389 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3207 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2600 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4928 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S785 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2389 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3207 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2600 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4928 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4080 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4080.pdf |