MA S785 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the accessibility and affordability of pharmaceutical drugs of public health concern. Health Care Financing.
Title
To improve the accessibility and affordability of pharmaceutical drugs of public health concern
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Accompanied S771 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1481 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S771 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - New draft substituted, see S2651
S1533 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S771 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - New draft substituted, see S2651
S1533 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S785 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S785.pdf |