MA S1481 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore integrity in the marketing of pharmaceutical products and medical devices. Public Health.
Title
To restore integrity in the marketing of pharmaceutical products and medical devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2772 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H3387 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
S255 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2772 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3387 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
S255 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2772 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1481 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1481.pdf |