CA SCR151 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles County Sheriff’s Deputy Ryan Clinkunbroomer Memorial Highway.
Title
Los Angeles County Sheriff’s Deputy Ryan Clinkunbroomer Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SCR 151 Stern Senate Third Reading By Schiavo (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR151 Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR151 Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4825.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Set for hearing June 24. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 4437.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Set for hearing June 11. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |