MA S2600 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to personal health information portability and accessibility. Public Health.
Title
Relative to personal health information portability and accessibility
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2917 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2022 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-12-13 | House | House concurred |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S225 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2600 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2600.pdf |