MA S225 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect personal identifying information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Protecting personal identifying information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2683 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | House | House concurred |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S232 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S593 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H521 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H1893 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1544 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S232 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S593 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2683 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H521 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H1893 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1544 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S225 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S225.pdf |