MA H3207 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5355
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to removing certain accessibility restrictions on public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to restricted vital records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5355 |
2022-10-17 | House | Read third |
2022-06-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5355 (Replaced by) 2022-10-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H366 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5355 (Replaced by) 2022-10-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H366 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3207.pdf |