MA H4059 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Deirdre Dacey, an employee of the Parole Board. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Deirdre Dacey, an employee of the Parole Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-03-09HouseEnacted
2018-03-09SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-03-09HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-03-05SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-03-05SenateRules suspended
2018-03-05SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2018-02-07SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-02-06HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-12-14HouseRules suspended
2017-12-14HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-12-07SenateSenate concurred
2017-11-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2017-11-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3949 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4919 (Similar To) 2018-10-01 - Senate concurred
H4943 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4957 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4986 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4992 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback