MA H4150 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Elise Sanchez-Oshea, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Elise Sanchez-Oshea, an employee of the trial court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
2018-03-22SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-03-21HouseEnacted
2018-03-19SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-03-19HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-03-15SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-03-15SenateRules suspended
2018-03-15SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2018-02-22SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-02-20HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-31HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-01-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-25SenateSenate concurred
2018-01-23HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3965 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2017
H3932 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2017
H2792 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2017
H3695 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2017
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2017
H4986 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4992 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback