MA H785 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Chris Grammaticas, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Chris Grammaticas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2792 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2017
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3923 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3949
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3943
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3929 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3947 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2018
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H4909 (Similar To) 2018-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2018
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3923 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3949
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3943
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3929 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3947 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2018
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H4909 (Similar To) 2018-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2018
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H785 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H785.pdf |