MA H4154 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Lauri Smith-Bopp, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Lauri Smith-Bopp, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4845 (Similar To) 2018-08-27 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4845 (Similar To) 2018-08-27 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4154.pdf |