MA H4980 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on December 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a House bill, No. 4961. November 21, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Rachael Purnell, an employee of the Trial Court

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-12-10HouseEnacted
2018-12-10SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-12-10HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-12-06SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-11-29SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-21HousePassed to be engrossed
2018-11-21HouseSubstituted for H4961

Same As/Similar To

H4961 (Similar To) 2018-12-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4980
H4957 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4943 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4986 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4992 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback