MA H4957 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for John Taylor Woodward, an employee of the Hampshire County Sheriff's Department. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for John Taylor Woodward, an employee of the Hampshire County Sheriff's Department

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-29HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2018-11-15HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-15HouseRules suspended
2018-11-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-11-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-11-05SenateSenate concurred
2018-11-01HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-10-29HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4919 (Similar To) 2018-10-01 - Senate concurred
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4992 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback