MA H4992 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for John S. Gay, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for John S. Gay, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-10HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-10HouseRules suspended
2018-12-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-10HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-06SenateSenate concurred
2018-11-29HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary
2018-11-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4986 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2792 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2017
H3695 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2017

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback