MA H4239 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4228). February 14, 2018.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Alyssa Nelson, an employee of the Office for Victim Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-03-05 | House | Enacted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-14 | House | Substituted for H4228 |
Same As/Similar To
H4228 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4239
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4239 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4239.pdf |