MA H3922 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4264
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an environmental justice policy. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to environmental justice communities
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. Roselee Vincent [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4264 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1943 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2903 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4264 (Replaced by) 2019-12-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1943 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2903 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4264 (Replaced by) 2019-12-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3922.pdf |