MA S1943 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to responsible emergency planning. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to responsible emergency planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H829 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1064 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2903 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback