MA H3105 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for right-of-way violations at intersections. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding right of way violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-24HouseRules suspended
2020-02-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
S1976 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback