MA H2838 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an historic building fire prevention tax credit. Revenue.
Title
To protect historic buildings from fires
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H2417 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S1162 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2510 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5221
H2417 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S1162 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2510 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5221
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2838 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2838.pdf |