MA H1988 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to place the inspection, testing and repair of fire protection systems under the prevailing wage law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Clarifying the prevailing wage law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1162 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1988 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1988.pdf |