MA S1162 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the prevailing wage law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Clarifying the prevailing wage law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1162 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1162.pdf |