MA H2417 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the installation of automatic sprinkler systems in certain new family dwellings. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to enhanced fire protection in new one- and two-family dwellings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1162 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2510 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5221
H2838 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1988 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2510 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5221
H2838 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2417.pdf |