MA H239 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the listing of the alcohol by volume for beer selections on menus. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
For all licensees for beer to be drunk on the premises must list the alcohol by volume for each beer selection on the menu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H260 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H306 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H319 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3939
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
S131 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H306 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H319 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3939
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
H225 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4692
S131 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H239 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H239.pdf |