MA H188 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an industrial mill building revitalization task force (including members of the General Court) to stimulate the re-development, rehabilitation and revitalization of industrial mill buildings and surrounding areas in the Commonwealth. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To establish to an industrial mill building task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft substituted, see H4256
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2114 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft substituted, see H4256
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2114 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H188.pdf |