MA H2690 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5103

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a task force (including members of the General Court) to study the need for increased cyber security within government agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring cyber security in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5103
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
H1325 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft substituted, see H4256
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback