MA H162 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure equitable health coverage for children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure equitable health coverage for children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H3476 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H132 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H328 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3435 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback