FL S7068 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Adding exceptions to the definition of the term "change of ownership" for purposes of a certain homestead assessment limitation; specifying that portions of property not used for certain purposes are not exempt from ad valorem taxation; providing that improvements to real property are deemed owned by certain educational institutions for purposes of the educational exemption from ad valorem taxation if certain criteria are met; providing that modifications of certain original documents for certain purposes on which documentary stamp taxes were previously paid are not renewals and are not subject to the documentary stamp tax; extending the expiration date of the sales tax exemption for data center property; creating the Strong Families Tax Credit; defining terms, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
2021-04-29SenateSubstituted HB 7061
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-28SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-27SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-26SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-22SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-19SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-30SenateIntroduced
2021-03-30SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateFiled
2021-03-25SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-22SenateSubmitted for consideration by Finance and Tax

Same As/Similar To

H1241 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
H531 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H889 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H897 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H917 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H1519 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H6071 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H6087 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H6093 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S58 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S258 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S598 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S734 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S908 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S982 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
S1214 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1254 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1920105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196198Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2110252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2113106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201876Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220198Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5611212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62451056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Amendment/143252/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Analyses/2021s07068.pre.ft.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Analyses/2021s07068.ft.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Analyses/2021s07068.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Analyses/2021s07068.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Vote/2021-03-25%200900AM~S07068%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7068/Vote/2021-04-19%201000AM~S07068%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback