FL S0982 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision prohibiting the certification of applicants after a specified date, etc.
Title
Tax Refund Program for Qualified Target Industry Businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6071 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)