FL S1214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that portions of property not used for certain purposes are not exempt from ad valorem taxation; specifying that exemptions for certain portions of property from ad valorem taxation are not affected so long as such portions of property are used for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Nonprofit Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-11 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H889 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)