FL S0734 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting federal loans related to a state of emergency from the excise tax imposed on documents; providing exemptions from the sales and use tax for specified disaster preparedness supplies during a specified timeframe; requiring purchasers of certain items to furnish a specified affidavit and information to the selling dealer; providing a criminal penalty for furnishing a false affidavit with certain intent, etc.
Title
Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/11/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/15/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)