FL H1241 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires tax collectors to accept late payments of prepaid property taxes; specifies severance tax rate for titanium; revises conditions for sales tax exception for tangible personal property exported out of state; specifies application requirements & procedures for forwarding agent; specifies procedures regarding forwarding agents and reporting tax; provides criminal penalties for certain violations; revises recordkeeping requirements for dealers collecting sales & use tax; provides that stolen sales tax revenue may be aggregated for purposes of determining grade of criminal offenses; authorizes DOR to publish list of forwarding agents' addresses on its website.
Title
Tax Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 3106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |