FL H7061 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that portions of property not used for certain purposes are not exempt from ad valorem taxation; specifying that exemptions for certain portions of property from ad valorem taxation are not affected so long as such portions of property are used for specified purposes; exempting certain multifamily projects from ad valorem taxation; requiring, rather than authorizing, tax collectors to accept late payments of prepaid property taxes within a certain timeframe; extending the expiration date of the sales tax exemption for data center property; exempting specified items that assist in independent living from the sales tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#458 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#269 (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Chapter No. 2021-31
2021-05-21 Approved by Governor
2021-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-30HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-30HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-30HousePassed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 1
2021-04-30HouseAmendment 938318 Concur
2021-04-30HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-30HouseIn Messages
2021-04-30SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (938318)
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 7068
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2021-04-23SenateReceived
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-23HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-23SenateIn Messages
2021-04-23HousePassed; YEAS 109, NAYS 3
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
2021-04-19HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-19HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-18House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H889 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H897 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H917 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H927 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H1241 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H1429 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
H6011 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S516 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture
S598 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S734 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S908 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1214 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S2008 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H531 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H789 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H1377 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
H1519 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H6087 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H6093 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S58 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S258 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S866 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1182 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed), HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1254 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H81 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S224 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1920105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196198Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2110253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2113106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21864Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220198Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28811625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5611213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62451057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Amendment/938318/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Analyses/h7061.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Analyses/h7061z.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Analyses/h7061z1.WMC.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Vote/HouseVote_h07061__269.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Vote/SenateVote_h07061__006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7061/Vote/HouseVote_h07061__458.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback