FL S1254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adding exceptions to the definition of the term "change of ownership" for purposes of a certain homestead assessment limitation; providing that changes, additions, or improvements, including ancillary improvements, to nonhomestead residential property damaged or destroyed by misfortune or calamity must be assessed upon substantial completion; providing that certain changes, additions, or improvements must be reassessed at just value in subsequent years, etc.
Title
Ad Valorem Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/31/21, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1519 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 1554 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 1555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 1557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |