FL H0643 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Miss Lillie Williams Street, John Torrese Family Road, Manuel Capo Way, Manuel Capo Boulevard, & Lt. Colonel Charles Brown Memorial Highway in Miami-Dade County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers; revises designation of Jose A. Marques Boulevard in Miami-Dade County.
Title
State Road Designations
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0613 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) | |
2010-03-24 | In Messages | |
2010-03-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00367; CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00367 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00332; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00332 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00225 | |
2010-03-05 | CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00221; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-03 | CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00222 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00058; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00169; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-01 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0827 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)